Virgilio Barco - Executive Director from Columbia - November 1, 1968 -October 31, 1974
- 01790363
- Pasta/Processo
- 1968-11-01 - 1974-10-31
4042 resultados com objetos digitais Mostrar resultados com objetos digitais
Virgilio Barco - Executive Director from Columbia - November 1, 1968 -October 31, 1974
Paul H. Kryger - Executive Director from Denmark - March 31, 1974 - October 31, 1974
Georges Pleascoff - Executive Director from France - September 1, 1967 -October 31, 1970
Senior Staff Photos (including Presidents Meyer, McCloy, Black - Cheek, Bruce
John M. Leddy - Executive Director from The United States - April 6,1961 - October 31, 1962
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Chang, Victor - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Duloy, John H. - v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Finlinson - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Insel, Barbara J. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Mitchnik, David Adolphe - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Olivares, Jose - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photos - LeJeune, Michael
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photos - McClure, Gordon
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photos - Nafie, Ibrahim
Joaquin Guitierre Cano - Executive Director from Spain - February 18,1963 - October 31, 1968
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Bronfman, Jose - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Cancio, L. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Chaufournier, R. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Freedman, Joseph - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Harrison, James Q. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs and Biographical Statement of Kaji, Gautam S. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photos - Lind, Lars
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Lee, Marijke - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Contacts and Photos of McCarthy, Gene - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Osei, Albert - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Parson - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Contacts and Photos of Quijano, Carlos - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Rahkonen, Ossi J. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Ramos, G. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Robinson - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Schaefer, Kehnert W. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Sterrett, Brigitte B. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Curriculum Vitae and Photos of Wyss, Hans - 1v
Senior Staff Photos (including Presidents Meyer, McCloy, Black - Cargill, I.P.M