Sri Lanka (Ceylon) - Credit 0595 - Country Photographs
- 01728126
- Bestanddeel
- 1975-12-24
4017 results with digital objects Show results with digital objects
Sri Lanka (Ceylon) - Credit 0595 - Country Photographs
Sri Lanka (Ceylon) - Credit 0666 - Country Photographs
Sudan - Credit 0002 - Loan 0284 - Country Photographs - Volume 5
Sudan - Credit 0331 - Country Photographs
Tanzania - Loan 1014 - Country Photograph
Thailand - Loan 0128 - Country Photographs
Thailand - Loan 0977 - Country Photograph
Turkey - Credit 0257 - Loan 0762, Loan 0763 - Country Photographs
Turkey - Loan 0063 - Country Photographs
Turkey - Loan 1754, Loan 1755 - Country Photographs
Venezuela - Loan 0435 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 1012, Loan 1013 - Country Photographs
Western Samoa - Credit 0951 - Investment 0032 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 0073 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 0777 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 0965, Loan 0966 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 1263 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 0836 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 0965 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 1370, Loan 1371 - Country Photographs
Yugoslavia - Loan 1819 - Country Photographs
Zambia - Loan 0701 - Country Photographs
Zambia - Loan 0469 - Country Photographs
Zambia - Loan 0592 - Country Photographs
Project Site and Loan Signing Photographs - Zambia Signing Photos (Oct. 1, 1986) - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Sirken, Irving A. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Smith - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Tavakoli, Sohrab F. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Turnham, David J. - 1v
Mozaffar M. Ahmad - Executive Director from Pakistan - August 22, 1972 -October 31, 1974
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Staff Announcement and Photo of Wijnand, J. - 1v
Hans E. Kastoft - Executive Director from Denmark - November 1, 1972 - March 31, 1974
Covy T. Oliver - Executive Director from United States - November 1, 1968 - November 3, 1969
Senior Staff Photos (including Presidents Meyer, McCloy, Black - Boskey, Shirley
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Blay, Paul - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Heron, Alfred - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Lancella, P. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Landell - Mills, Pierre M. - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Lim, Edwin - 1v
Senior Staff and Executive Directors Photographs - Biographical Statement and Lust, Herbert A. - 1v